THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:01:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Misr University for Science & Technology, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Misr University for Science & Technology, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Oct 2023
30 Sep 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 17 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SALLY ALY MOHAMED MASHALLY may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, at the University of Ottawa, in which Dr. MASHALLY holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MASHALLY no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MASHALLY’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MASHALLY’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 October, 2023, and expires on 30 September, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. MASHALLY's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SALLY ALY MOHAMED MASHALLY may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, at the University of Ottawa, in which Dr. MASHALLY holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MASHALLY no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MASHALLY’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MASHALLY’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 October, 2023, and expires on 30 September, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. MASHALLY's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Misr University for Science & Technology, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Oct 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Apr 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Sep 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2015