THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 90 Main St E
Unit 5
Milton ON L9T 1N3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 3658775600
Fax: 3658775700
Address: Victoria Hospital
1200 24 th Street West
Prince Albert Saskatchewan S6V 4B2
Phone: 13067656000
Extension: 6225
Fax: 3067656232

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
Jamaica
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 90 Main St E
Unit 5
Milton ON L9T 1N3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 3658775600
Fax: 3658775700
Address: Victoria Hospital
1200 24 th Street West
Prince Albert Saskatchewan S6V 4B2
Phone: 13067656000
Extension: 6225
Fax: 3067656232

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
Jamaica
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON SHANE MARTIN-BARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN-BARKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON SHANE MARTIN-BARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN-BARKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2015