THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 22:33:19 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
Healthy Living Clinic
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Judith Seary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Dec 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
Healthy Living Clinic
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Judith Seary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Dec 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDITH ANNE SEARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEARY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDITH ANNE SEARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEARY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2015