THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:40:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Philips House Site
10 Buchan Court
North York
Toronto Ontario M2J 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6933
Fax: 416-756-6934

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Philips House Site
10 Buchan Court
North York
Toronto Ontario M2J 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6933
Fax: 416-756-6934

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA HOLLACE MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA HOLLACE MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2015