THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:07:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
24 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
07 Apr 2015 to 23 May 2015
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 24 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 07 Apr 2015 to 23 May 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2015