THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:52:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CP 43063
Dominique Denver
Levis Quebec G6W 7N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CP 43063
Dominique Denver
Levis Quebec G6W 7N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE FRANCOISE DENVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENVER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE FRANCOISE DENVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENVER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2015