THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:30:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CISSSO - H“pital de Gatineau
909 Boul. La Verendrye Ouest
Gatineau Quebec J8P 7H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (819) 966-6100
Extension: 6165
Fax: (819) 966-6203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CISSSO - H“pital de Gatineau
909 Boul. La Verendrye Ouest
Gatineau Quebec J8P 7H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (819) 966-6100
Extension: 6165
Fax: (819) 966-6203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOROTHEE LEDUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDUC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOROTHEE LEDUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDUC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2019
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 15 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2015