THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:46:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: (705) 876-5120
Address: Fleming College Health clinic
599 Brealey Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B1
Phone: 7057495504
Fax: 7057495532

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Past patients can call the Brookdale Clinic at 705 743 8029 to request a copy of their files.
Date Received: 27 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marie-Helene Laplante Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: (705) 876-5120
Address: Fleming College Health clinic
599 Brealey Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B1
Phone: 7057495504
Fax: 7057495532

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Past patients can call the Brookdale Clinic at 705 743 8029 to request a copy of their files.
Date Received: 27 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marie-Helene Laplante Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-HELENE LAPLANTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPLANTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-HELENE LAPLANTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPLANTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2015