THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:31:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-1 Wexford Rd
Wexford Medical Clinic
Brampton Ontario L6Z 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 970-1600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5-1 Wexford Rd
Wexford Medical Clinic
Brampton Ontario L6Z 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 970-1600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIOLA KAMAL BATRA HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIOLA KAMAL BATRA HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2015