THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:24:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2015