THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:46:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 222 King St. East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-623-2355
Fax: 905-623-9607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Feb 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 222 King St. East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-623-2355
Fax: 905-623-9607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Feb 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ADAM KASSEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ADAM KASSEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015