THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:08:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE AMANDA TUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUCKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE AMANDA TUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUCKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015