THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:15:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 May 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 May 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMZY ABDEL-GALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-GALIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMZY ABDEL-GALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-GALIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015