THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:33:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 The Boardwalk
Pulse Family Practice
203
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2262432043
Fax: 2262153503
Address: 44 Francis Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2A2
Phone: (519) 745-4404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-310 King St E
Sanctuary Refugee Health Centre
Kitchener ON N2G 2L3
Phone: 226-336-1321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 The Boardwalk
Pulse Family Practice
203
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2262432043
Fax: 2262153503
Address: 44 Francis Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2A2
Phone: (519) 745-4404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-310 King St E
Sanctuary Refugee Health Centre
Kitchener ON N2G 2L3
Phone: 226-336-1321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANISHA HLADIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HLADIO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANISHA HLADIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HLADIO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015