THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:59:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057432121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Foohey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057432121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Foohey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH KATHLEEN FOOHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOOHEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH KATHLEEN FOOHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOOHEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015