THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:35:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 12 - 2425 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON M1K 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-757-7117
Fax: 647-689-7572
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6031
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Birchmount
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-495-2400
Extension: 5339
Fax: 416-295-2457
Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
4 East
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: 416 603 5800
Extension: 6145
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 12 - 2425 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON M1K 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-757-7117
Fax: 647-689-7572
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6031
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Birchmount
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-495-2400
Extension: 5339
Fax: 416-295-2457
Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
4 East
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: 416 603 5800
Extension: 6145
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015