THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:37:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maitland Valley Medical Centre
Department of Family Medicine
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich Ontario N7A 4N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 524-7802
Fax: 5195245225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Duckworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maitland Valley Medical Centre
Department of Family Medicine
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich Ontario N7A 4N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 524-7802
Fax: 5195245225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Duckworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK BEREND JAN DUCKWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCKWORTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK BEREND JAN DUCKWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCKWORTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015