THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:30:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1112 Saint Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-526-1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10405 Lockport Rd
United States Department of Defense
Niagara Falls NY United States 14304-1129
Phone: 4632034382
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - California
USA - Illinois
USA - New York
USA - Virginia

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law USA - New York
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1112 Saint Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-526-1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10405 Lockport Rd
United States Department of Defense
Niagara Falls NY United States 14304-1129
Phone: 4632034382
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - California
USA - Illinois
USA - New York
USA - Virginia

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law USA - New York
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURENCE JOSEPH BATMAZIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATMAZIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURENCE JOSEPH BATMAZIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATMAZIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015