THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 09:46:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5546 Portage Rd
Neurologic Clinic
Niagara Falls Ontario L2X 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-357-3644
Fax: 905-357-9230

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5546 Portage Rd
Neurologic Clinic
Niagara Falls Ontario L2X 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-357-3644
Fax: 905-357-9230

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANDEEP KAUR SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANDEEP KAUR SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015