THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:01:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Pediatric Medicine
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3535 Ch Queen-Mary
Clinique Medicale Bloom
Montréal QC H3V 1H8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Respirology
Effective: 06 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Pediatric Medicine
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3535 Ch Queen-Mary
Clinique Medicale Bloom
Montréal QC H3V 1H8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Respirology
Effective: 06 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAROLINA JOANNA POPLAWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPLAWSKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAROLINA JOANNA POPLAWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPLAWSKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015