THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Baqai Medical College, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Baqai Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Baqai Medical College, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Internal Medicine
24 Oct 2016 to 06 Nov 2016
University of Toronto
EL - Hematology
20 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
University of Toronto
EL - Hematology
01 Jul 2015 to 19 Jul 2015
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: EL - Internal Medicine
DATE: 24 Oct 2016 to 06 Nov 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Hematology
DATE: 20 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Jul 2015
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015