THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 19:50:35 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: OMNI Clinic
20260 County Rd 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 525-5702
Fax: 855-613-7647
Address: 241 Eighth St
Cochrane Ontario P0L1C0
Phone: 705-272-7200
Fax: 855-613-7647

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical record requests, patients can call the Omni Clinic at 613-525-5702 on Thursdays between 8:00 am and10:00 am or email their requests to omni.clinic@outlook.com.
Date Received: 12 Aug 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Bilodeau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bilodeau (CPSO#: 106398 )
Business Address: 1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Business Address: 725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
(613) 525-2222
Business Address: 291 Hoffman Crescent
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3M3
(613) 525-2222
Business Address: 368 Slater Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 5C1
Business Address: 241 Eighth Street
Cochrane Ontario P0L 1C0
Business Address: 61 5th Street
Englehart Ontario P0J 1H0
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria ON K0C 1A0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: OMNI Clinic
20260 County Rd 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 525-5702
Fax: 855-613-7647
Address: 241 Eighth St
Cochrane Ontario P0L1C0
Phone: 705-272-7200
Fax: 855-613-7647

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical record requests, patients can call the Omni Clinic at 613-525-5702 on Thursdays between 8:00 am and10:00 am or email their requests to omni.clinic@outlook.com.
Date Received: 12 Aug 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Bilodeau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bilodeau (CPSO#: 106398 )
Business Address: 1405 Edward Street
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Business Address: 725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
(613) 525-2222
Business Address: 291 Hoffman Crescent
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3M3
(613) 525-2222
Business Address: 368 Slater Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 5C1
Business Address: 241 Eighth Street
Cochrane Ontario P0L 1C0
Business Address: 61 5th Street
Englehart Ontario P0J 1H0
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria ON K0C 1A0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC BILODEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILODEAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC BILODEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILODEAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Dec 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Dec 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 19 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015