THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:13:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 94 Stuart St
Room 3022
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 King St W
Kingston ON K7L 2W7
Phone: 6133847640
Fax: 6146348595

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 94 Stuart St
Room 3022
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 King St W
Kingston ON K7L 2W7
Phone: 6133847640
Fax: 6146348595

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN OBEDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBEDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN OBEDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBEDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015