THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Touro College of Osteopathic Medicine NY, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 780-1237
Fax: (226) 780-5276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jul 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Touro College of Osteopathic Medicine NY, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 780-1237
Fax: (226) 780-5276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jul 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Dec 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 14 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Candice Nicole Barra may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Candice Nicole Barra may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Touro College of Osteopathic Medicine NY, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015