THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:15:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 316-4789 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-351-6501
Fax: (647) 797-0224

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 316-4789 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-351-6501
Fax: (647) 797-0224

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY ALLAN GOLDFARB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDFARB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY ALLAN GOLDFARB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDFARB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015