THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:10:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 701
240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 229 6300
Fax: (416) 229-6283
Address: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
High Risk Breast Clinic
M6
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 701
240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 229 6300
Fax: (416) 229-6283
Address: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
High Risk Breast Clinic
M6
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA MELISSA ZENDEL BERLINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZENDEL BERLINER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA MELISSA ZENDEL BERLINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZENDEL BERLINER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015