THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:03:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tabriz University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Saint Theresa Point Nursing Station
PO Box 410
Saint Theresa Point Manitoba R0B 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (204) 462-2737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 14987 yonge st
Aurora Ontario L4G 1M5
Phone: (905) 503-6100
Fax: 9055031000

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Vakilitahami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jul 2022

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Vakilitahami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tabriz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Saint Theresa Point Nursing Station
PO Box 410
Saint Theresa Point Manitoba R0B 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (204) 462-2737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 14987 yonge st
Aurora Ontario L4G 1M5
Phone: (905) 503-6100
Fax: 9055031000

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Vakilitahami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jul 2022

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Vakilitahami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HABIB VAKILITAHAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKILITAHAMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HABIB VAKILITAHAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKILITAHAMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tabriz University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2015