THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:10:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705-1849 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-481-4433
Fax: 416-663-3731
Address: A5-9135 Keele St
Concord ON L4K 0J4
Phone: (416) 663- 3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
Address: 208-25 Industrial St
East York ON M4G 1Z2
Phone: 1-833-864-3964
Fax: 416-745-1511
Address: 309-1033 Bay St
Toronto ON M5S 3A5
Phone: 416-962-5005
Fax: 416-962-5856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705-1849 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-481-4433
Fax: 416-663-3731
Address: A5-9135 Keele St
Concord ON L4K 0J4
Phone: (416) 663- 3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
Address: 208-25 Industrial St
East York ON M4G 1Z2
Phone: 1-833-864-3964
Fax: 416-745-1511
Address: 309-1033 Bay St
Toronto ON M5S 3A5
Phone: 416-962-5005
Fax: 416-962-5856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA GEETANJALI JAGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA GEETANJALI JAGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015