THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:53:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Mary's General Hospital
Geriatric Medically Complex Clinic
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-749-6425
Fax: 519-749-6498
Address: 5915 Leslie Street
Love Toronto Korean-Canadian Community Services
Suite 204
Toronto Ontario M2H 1J8
Phone: 647-346-5688
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Mary's General Hospital
Geriatric Medically Complex Clinic
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-749-6425
Fax: 519-749-6498
Address: 5915 Leslie Street
Love Toronto Korean-Canadian Community Services
Suite 204
Toronto Ontario M2H 1J8
Phone: 647-346-5688
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015