THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:40:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Neurology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 2631
Fax: 613-548-1388

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Neurology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 2631
Fax: 613-548-1388

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYCE AUSTIN DURAFOURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURAFOURT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYCE AUSTIN DURAFOURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURAFOURT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015