THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:57:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
12 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
20 Mar 2017 to 11 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
EL - Gastroenterology
06 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 12 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
DATE: 20 Mar 2017 to 11 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Gastroenterology
DATE: 06 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2015