THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:42:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 Church St
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
Geriatric Psychiatry
Horizon Program
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-705-549-3181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 Church St
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
Geriatric Psychiatry
Horizon Program
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-705-549-3181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCUS ALLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCUS ALLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015