THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:32:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 145 Front Street East
unit g1
Toronto Ontario M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: Tel: (416) 591-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Inner City Family Team
69 Queen St. E, 4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R8
Phone: 416 368 5666
Fax: 416 368 2679

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 145 Front Street East
unit g1
Toronto Ontario M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: Tel: (416) 591-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Inner City Family Team
69 Queen St. E, 4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R8
Phone: 416 368 5666
Fax: 416 368 2679

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANETTE ELIZABETH SPEARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPEARE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANETTE ELIZABETH SPEARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPEARE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015