THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:11:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4132 50 Avenue
Red Deer Alberta T4N 3Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4033479037
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mitic (CPSO#: 107100 )
Business Address: 3400-350 7 Avenue Northwest
Calgary Alberta T2N 0Y7
Business Address: 1583- 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4132 50 Avenue
Red Deer Alberta T4N 3Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4033479037
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mitic (CPSO#: 107100 )
Business Address: 3400-350 7 Avenue Northwest
Calgary Alberta T2N 0Y7
Business Address: 1583- 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY IRENE MITIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY IRENE MITIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015