THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:59:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2018 to 20 Aug 2018
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
21 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
01 Jul 2015 to 20 Aug 2015
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 20 Aug 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 21 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Aug 2015
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Aug 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015