THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:32:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GUJARATI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3775 Kingston Rd
Scarborough ON M1J 3H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-438-1664
Fax: 416-438-3646
Address: 2250 Lawrence Ave East
Unit 102
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2P5
Phone: 1-877-406-9362
Fax: 877-792-5201

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GUJARATI, URDU
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3775 Kingston Rd
Scarborough ON M1J 3H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-438-1664
Fax: 416-438-3646
Address: 2250 Lawrence Ave East
Unit 102
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2P5
Phone: 1-877-406-9362
Fax: 877-792-5201

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALEHA GANGAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALEHA GANGAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015