THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:25:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3134 Hospital Drive Northwest
Foothills Medical Centre - McCaig Tower
Orthopaedic Trauma Surgery
Ground Floor
Calgary Alberta T2N 5A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (403) 9444 793
Fax: (403) 270 8004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Johal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3134 Hospital Drive Northwest
Foothills Medical Centre - McCaig Tower
Orthopaedic Trauma Surgery
Ground Floor
Calgary Alberta T2N 5A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (403) 9444 793
Fax: (403) 270 8004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Johal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERMAN SINGH JOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERMAN SINGH JOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2015