THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:52:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Emergency Medicine
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
Emergency Department
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 835 King Street West
Grand River Hospital
Emergency Department
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-749-2018
Fax: 519-749-2018
Address: 1-3095 Glen Erin Dr
Unit 10
Mississauga ON L5L 1J3
Phone: (416) 840-3500
Fax: (416) 840-3553

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Emergency Medicine
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
Emergency Department
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 835 King Street West
Grand River Hospital
Emergency Department
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-749-2018
Fax: 519-749-2018
Address: 1-3095 Glen Erin Dr
Unit 10
Mississauga ON L5L 1J3
Phone: (416) 840-3500
Fax: (416) 840-3553

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL UPPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPPAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL UPPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPPAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015