THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:44:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 75166
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 26 Legend Crt
Ancaster ON L9K 1J3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr B Bhangoo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 75166
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 26 Legend Crt
Ancaster ON L9K 1J3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr B Bhangoo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BALJOET SINGH BHANGOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANGOO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BALJOET SINGH BHANGOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANGOO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015