THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:54:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Gordon St
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
Whitby ON L1N 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-430-4055 X6615
Fax: 905-430-4480

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Gordon St
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
Whitby ON L1N 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-430-4055 X6615
Fax: 905-430-4480

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYBILLE MCKENZIE LINDSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDSAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYBILLE MCKENZIE LINDSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDSAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015