THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:12:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2019 to 31 Mar 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
04 Aug 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Mar 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 04 Aug 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2015