THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:00:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH
COMPASS
100 Stokes Street, 3rd floor
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-595-6019
Fax: 416-595-6821

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH
COMPASS
100 Stokes Street, 3rd floor
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-595-6019
Fax: 416-595-6821

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY MARIA KENDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENDELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY MARIA KENDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENDELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2015