THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:47:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Addis Ababa University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Addis Ababa University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Addis Ababa University, 2002
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
31 Dec 2023 to 09 Jan 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Dec 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
03 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
09 Jan 2023 to 02 Apr 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 31 Dec 2023 to 09 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Dec 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 03 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
DATE: 09 Jan 2023 to 02 Apr 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015