THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:13:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 York St
Suite 1500
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163505900
Fax: 4163505981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TRUDY MCFARLANE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 York St
Suite 1500
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163505900
Fax: 4163505981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TRUDY MCFARLANE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRUDY MCFARLANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFARLANE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRUDY MCFARLANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFARLANE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2015