THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:15:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 College Dr
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Maplewood Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 5H2
Phone: (705) 478-0968
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 14 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1K2
Phone: 4169600145
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 - 69 Queen St E
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R8
Phone: (416) 640-2384
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 College Dr
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Emergency Department
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Maplewood Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 5H2
Phone: (705) 478-0968
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 14 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1K2
Phone: 4169600145
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 - 69 Queen St E
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R8
Phone: (416) 640-2384
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCY FRAYNE DUVAL MANCHESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANCHESTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCY FRAYNE DUVAL MANCHESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANCHESTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2015