THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:57:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA COLL OF MED, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Childrens Hospital Of Eastern
Ontario
Department of Psychiatry
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2723
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Aug 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA COLL OF MED, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Childrens Hospital Of Eastern
Ontario
Department of Psychiatry
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2723
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 05 Aug 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Jul 2022
31 Aug 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 22 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 31 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Kathleen Ann Pajer may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Pajer holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Pajer no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 5, 2015, and expires on August 31,
2027. Upon renewal of Dr. Pajer's academic appointment at the University of
Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in
paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Kathleen Ann Pajer may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Pajer holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Pajer no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 5, 2015, and expires on August 31,
2027. Upon renewal of Dr. Pajer's academic appointment at the University of
Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in
paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA COLL OF MED, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Aug 2027
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Aug 2027

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2015