THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:51:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Millway Medical Centre
Unit 7
3200 Erin MIlls Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5L 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-0017
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1100 Dundas St W, Unit #4,6
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E7
Phone: 416-530-4966
Fax: 416-530-4457

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Millway Medical Centre
Unit 7
3200 Erin MIlls Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5L 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-0017
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1100 Dundas St W, Unit #4,6
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E7
Phone: 416-530-4966
Fax: 416-530-4457

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAWEL DRZADZEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRZADZEWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAWEL DRZADZEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRZADZEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2015