THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:55:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33A Broadway Avenue, Unit 1
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-938-9997
Fax: 519-938-9597
Address: 881 King Street West
King West Medical Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1K5
Phone: 905-529-8030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Dundas St E
Telemed FHG
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: 905-232-0720
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1980 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6N 4X9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Feb 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33A Broadway Avenue, Unit 1
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-938-9997
Fax: 519-938-9597
Address: 881 King Street West
King West Medical Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1K5
Phone: 905-529-8030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Dundas St E
Telemed FHG
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: 905-232-0720
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1980 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6N 4X9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Feb 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Nov 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 25 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Katie Antoun Awad may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Katie Antoun Awad may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2015