THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:48:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Plains Rd E
Burlington ON L7T 2E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-635-7313
Fax: 905-635-2464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Plains Rd E
Burlington ON L7T 2E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-635-7313
Fax: 905-635-2464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANS DAVID SCHAEFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHAEFER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANS DAVID SCHAEFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHAEFER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2023
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 09 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2015