THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:47:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1992
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
15 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Hematology
17 Aug 2015 to 14 Oct 2015
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 15 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Hematology
DATE: 17 Aug 2015 to 14 Oct 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2015